Identity area
Type of entity
Person
Authorized form of name
Fiandor, António Ferreira. 1884-1970, bispo
Parallel form(s) of name
- António Ferreira Fiandor
Standardized form(s) of name according to other rules
Other form(s) of name
Identifiers for corporate bodies
AFF
Description area
Dates of existence
1884-1970
History
D. António Ferreira Fiandor nasceu no Porto, em 1884. Após o ensino elementar, obtém emprego numa oficina de escultura religiosa. Em 1901 assiste a um culto, pela primeira vez, na Igreja Lusitana do Redentor (Porto), integrando-se desde logo nas atividades da comunidade. Entre 1903 e 1907 frequenta o Curso Teológico ministrado por John Harden, no Prado. Entretanto (1905) é licenciado como pregador pelo Sínodo.
A 26 de Abril de 1908 é instituído diácono, em Madrid, pelo Bispo D. Juan Bautista Cabrera. Designado coadjutor do Reverendo Flower, no Redentor. Em 1911, nesta paróquia, é ordenado Presbítero, também pelo Bispo Cabrera, da Igreja Espanhola Reformada Episcopal. De Maio de 1908 a Novembro de 1923 é Ministro-Coadjutor da Igreja do Redentor, no Porto.
Após a morte de Diogo Cassels, em 1923, este deixa a Fiandor a herança: substituição na direcção da Escola do Torne e pastor da Igreja de S. João Evangelista.
Em Novembro de 1957, o Sínodo Diocesano (de que era Presidente desde 1939) elege-o Bispo da Igreja. Foi sagrado em 22 de Junho de 1958, na Catedral de São Paulo, em Lisboa. Foram bispos sagrantes D. Plínio Simões (Igreja Episcopal Brasileira), Normann Nash (Igreja Episcopal dos EUA) e James McCann, da Igreja da Irlanda.
Em 1960 resignou à presidência do Sínodo, por limite de idade. Manteve-se como diocesano até à sagração de D. Luís Pereira, em 1962, continuando ao serviço da Igreja até ao fim dos seus dias.
Ainda em 1968 participou nos eventos comemorativos do centenário da Escola do Torne, que dirigiu durante quase meio século. Faleceu em 23 de Julho de 1970.
The Right Reverend Bishop António Ferreira Fiandor was born in Oporto in 1884. After the primary School, he started to work at a handcraft religious images office. In 1901 he joined for the first time a Service at The Redeemer parish of The Lusitanian Church – Oporto – and immediately he started to join the activities of this local church. Between 1903 and 1907 he attended the Theological Studies being the responsible for this Course Mr. John Harden, at the Prado parish. Meanwhile, in 1905 The Synod gave him authorisation to become a Licensed Preacher. On April 26, 1908 he was appointed Deacon of the Church in Madrid by the Right Reverend Bishop Juan Bautista Cabrera. Then he was appointed Assistant to the Reverend Flower at the Redeemer parish. In 1911 he was Ordained to the Ministry, also by Bishop Cabrera from the Spanish Reformed Episcopal Church. From May 1908 to November 1923 he was Auxiliar- Minister to the Redeemer Parish in Oporto. After the death of Diogo Cassels (named James Cassels before becoming a Portuguese citizen), in 1923, he inherited the responsibility of being Tutor of the Primary School and Minister of St. John the Evangelist parish. In November 1957 the Diocesan Synod (to which he was The President since 1939) elects his name to become the Bishop of the Lusitanian Church. He was consecrated on June 22, 1958 at the Saint Paul Cathedral in Lisbon. The Consecrators Bishops were: the Right Reverend Bishop Plinio Simões from the Brazilian Episcopal Church; The Right Reverend Bishop Norman Nash from the United States Episcopal Church and The Right Reverend Bishop James McCann from the Irish Episcopal Church. In 1960 because of age limit he resigned being The President of the Synod. He remained as Diocesan Bishop till the Consecration of the Right Reverend Bishop Luís Pereira in 1962, but always following the works and Mission of the Church to the end of his life.
Still in 1968 he took part in Centennial Celebration Events of the Primary School of Torne Church, which he served for almost half a century. He passed away peacefully on July 23 1970.
Places
Vila Nova de Gaia (cidade, Portugal)
Legal status
Functions, occupations and activities
Pregador
Presbítero
Bispo
Mandates/sources of authority
Internal structures/genealogy
General context
Relationships area
Related entity
Identifier of the related entity
Category of the relationship
Dates of the relationship
Description of relationship
Related entity
Identifier of the related entity
Category of the relationship
Dates of the relationship
Description of relationship
Related function
Related function
Related function
Related function
Access points area
Subject access points
Place access points
Occupations
Control area
Authority record identifier
PT ILCAE AFF
Institution identifier
Igreja Lusitana Católica Apostólica Evangélica
Rules and/or conventions used
ISAAR(CPF): Norma internacional de registos de autoridade arquivística para pessoas colectivas, pessoas singulares e famílias. 2.ª ed. Lisboa: IAN/TT, 2004.
Status
Draft
Level of detail
Minimal
Dates of creation, revision and deletion
13.04.15 (AV);
Language(s)
- Portuguese
Script(s)
- Latin
Sources
NETO, Vítor (2001). “A Igreja Lusitana Evangélica: génese e consolidação (1880-1991)” in Luís A. de Oliveira RAMOS, Jorge Martins RIBEIRO, Amélia POLÓNIA (coords.), Estudos em homenagem a João Francisco Marques, coord. . Porto: Faculdade de Letras da Universidade do Porto, v. 1, p. 185-197
PEIXOTO, Fernando (2001). Diogo Cassels. Uma vida em duas margens. Vila Nova de Gaia: Câmara Municipal de Gaia.